CHARITY CHALLENGES FOR KIDS

Charity Number: 1151699
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to help children in the UK who need funds for medical treatment or operations, where access to such treatment or operations is not available to them in the UK. We will provide families with the practical support, guidance and assistance to help them achieve their fundraising goals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2014

Total income: £12,019
Total expenditure: £11,683

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2013: CIO registration
  • 19 February 2016: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 19 February 2016: Funds transferred to 518086 FIVE STARS APPEAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CCFK (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2014
Total gross income £12.02k
Total expenditure £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2014 21 May 2015 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not submitted