MARTIAL ARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of healthy recreation via the provision of opportunities for the practice of martial arts and in particular through:- 1) The provision of grants or bursaries to assist those who otherwise would be unable to afford training. 2) The provision of resources such as equipment, facilities and teachers to poorly funded or under resourced clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Camden
- Cardiff
- Haringey
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Norfolk
- Southampton City
Governance
- 05 September 2013: Standard registration
- 30 May 2024: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- MACT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92k | £3.08k | £3.93k | £3.03k | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.10k | £10.05k | £1.92k | £4.19k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PRACTICE OF MARTIAL ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1. THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR BURSARIES TO ASSIST THOSE UNABLE TO AFFORD TRAINING; 2. THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES SUCH AS EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND TEACHERS TO POORLY FUNDED OR UNDER RESOURCED CLUBS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window