Accounts and annual returns MASJID AS-SUNNAH (ACCRINGTON)

Charity number: 1152671
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 February 2025 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 February 2025 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 April 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 May 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2021 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required