THE DINNINGTON MINERS WELFARE AND CLOTHING SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dinnington OAP Miners welfare Local sporting activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rotherham
Governance
- 15 October 1974: Standard registration
- 25 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £2.00k | £1.84k | £1.79k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £1.29k | £1.62k | £1.77k | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 27 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 27 October 2017 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07 JUN 2004
Charitable objects
TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND OLD AGE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG MINEWORKERS AND FORMER MINEWORKERS LIVING IN DINNINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND THEIR FAMILIES. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SCOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF DINNINGTON WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DINNINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window