Accounts and annual returns SPEADA

Charity number: 1152254
Charity reporting is overdue by 1488 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
Annual return 14 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
Annual return 14 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
Annual return 14 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1123 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1123 days
Annual return 14 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1488 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1488 days