SALUS FATIGUE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salus Fatigue Foundation provides face to face and on-line support and education and helps in the long term to inspire people affected by fatigue related conditions to improve their health and wellbeing. A world in which every person affected by fatigue has access to positive support and the opportunity to participate in all aspects of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £53,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 May 2013: CIO registration
- 12 June 2013: Funds received from 1139472 SALUS FATIGUE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Holland | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Holmshaw | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Damion Joel Latham | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTINE LLOYD | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.00k | £156.55k | £108.83k | £144.71k | £116.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.00k | £147.00k | £122.30k | £128.73k | £136.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.60k | £40.00k | £35.00k | £53.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 May 2013 as amended on 06 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO LIVE WITH CHRONIC FATIGUE AND RELATED CONDITIONS, THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH ADVICE, SUPPORT, COUNSELLING AND EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salus Fatigue Foundation
C/O Bissell & Brown Ltd
56 High Street
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B72 1UJ
- Phone:
- 07809246674
- Email:
- info@salus.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window