Trustees KING'S LYNN COMMUNITY FOOTBALL
Charity number: 1153978

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Graham Buhlemann | Chair | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Dickson | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Rust | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean McQuaid | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Anthony Hemeter | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Vincent Beeby | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN Paul DICKSON BED HONS | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.