JADE YOUTH & COMMUNITY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JADE Provides a range of services for young people and the wider community that support personal development, education and safeguard young people, helping them to develop the skills needed to grow and achieve. The area of Rother Valley South where JADE operates is a former mining community with a number of indicators of deprivation that affect young people and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £27,416 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 September 2013: Standard registration
- J.A.D.E (Working name)
- JUST ANOTHER DANCE EVENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR L COLLINS | Chair | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Veitch-Straw | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR M SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR D OLDROYD | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.13k | £379.40k | £365.63k | £375.83k | £352.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.99k | £306.42k | £338.34k | £346.72k | £380.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £29.25k | £19.92k | £27.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 NOV 2017 as amended on 07 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN ROTHERHAM AND SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JADE
Former Customer Service Centre
Dinnington
New St
Sheffield
S25 2EX
- Phone:
- 01909565639
- Email:
- jadehq@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window