LIFE KEYS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support offenders and ex-offenders be rehabilitated by: Providing Bible study courses; Providing programs and interventions to support vulnerable offenders and ex-offenders and to challenge offending behavior To build a supportive network of local churches to enable us to facilitate the above activities, and To advance the Christian faith through evangelistic activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £375 | |
|
Total expenditure | £830 | £171 | £60 | £109 | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT OFFENDERS AND EX-OFFENDERS WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THEM BE REHABILITATED AND PREVENTING RE-OFFENDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING BIBLE STUDY COURSES; B) PROVIDING PROGRAMMES AND INTERVENTIONS TO SUPPORT VULNERABLE OFFENDERS AND EX-OFFENDERS AND TO CHALLENGE OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR; C) TO BUILD A SUPPORTIVE NETWORK OF LOCAL CHURCHES TO ENABLE US TO FACILITATE THE ABOVE ACTIVITIES, AND 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH EVANGELISTIC ACTIVITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window