CAMP AMAZING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camp Amazing runs a yearly camping event for children with complex medical needs and life limiting illness and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 23 July 2013: Standard registration
- 28 July 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 14 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH COMPLEX MEDICAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF: · A SAFE AND AFFORDABLE CAMPING EVENT; · ADVICE AND SUPPORT; AND · RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL EVENTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window