Accounts and annual returns LICHFIELD LITTLE EXPLORERS

Charity number: 1153077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 06 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 04 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 14 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 14 April 2015 On Time