GRANTHAM MUSLIM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic religion by providing a designated place of worship for Muslim residents. The promotion of education and of of religious harmony by providing education and information on Islam and social issues for both Muslims and non-Muslims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHAFQAT ABRAR MBBCH | Chair | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fawad Ashraf | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Shamaila Mufti | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SALEEM AJUMAL | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD YASIN | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fathima Shereen AJUMAL | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.44k | £391.70k | £61.83k | £47.29k | £67.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.43k | £149.66k | £266.15k | £11.39k | £174.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY PROVIDING A DESIGNATED PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR MUSLIM RESIDENTS, WHETHER THEY ARE MALE, FEMALE, YOUNG ELDERLY OR DISABLED. B. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS APPROPRIATE INCLUDING WORKING WITH THE LOCAL COUNCIL, SCHOOLS AND OTHER LOCAL ORGANISATIONS TO DELIVER EDUCATION. C. THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ON A WIDE RANGE OF ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE?S HEALTH AND SAFETY. D. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ON ISLAM AND SOCIAL ISSUES FOR BOTH MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS. E. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GMCA
7 Elmer Street North
GRANTHAM
NG31 6RE
- Phone:
- 07985403592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window