BURTON STREET ANGELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As an expression of Christian faith, to promote the physical, mental and spiritual health and wellbeing of people using Burton town center in the late evening, by the provision of pastoral care, a compassionate listening ear, practical assistance where able and information/signposting to other services, regardless of a person's age, gender, race, religion, sexual identity, background or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 September 2013: Standard registration
- 17 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £551 | £841 | £1.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £2.26k | £1.79k | £507 | £281 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/08/2013
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECT IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN BURTON UPON TRENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITY, TO SUPPORT, CARE AND TREAT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH :- TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND THE FORMATION OF A STREET ANGELS PROGRAMME PROVIDING A COMPASSIONATE LISTENING EAR FOR ALL PROBLEMS AND PRACTICAL ADVICE ON STAYING SAFE ON THE STREETS SUCH AS CONTACT DETAILS FOR TAXI FIRMS / EXTERNAL AGENCIES, WARM DRINKS, FLIP FLOPS ETC AND SIMPLE FIRST AID MAY BE ADMINISTERED BY THOSE WHO HAVE HAD APPROPRIATE TRAINING.
Area of benefit
BURTON UPON TRENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window