THE GREEN GATHERING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To education the public in arts and environmental sustainability through the arts and to encourage the public to participate in the said arts by commissioning an annual event to promote education for environmental sustainability and any other activities that promote its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alero Agindotan | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Ceinwen Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mickey Murphy | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE MUGGERIDGE | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176 | £45.22k | £22.50k | £52.52k | £60.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £45.89k | £22.35k | £52.95k | £43.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.52k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2014 as amended on 24 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ARTS AND THE SUSTAINABLE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND ENDANGERED SPECIES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS MUSIC, DRAMA, POETRY READING, SCULPTURE, PAINTING, HANDICRAFTS AND ALL OTHER ASSOCIATED ARTS, AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SAID ARTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND OTHER ITEMS NECESSARY FOR THE BETTER PERFORMANCE OF THE OBJECTS HEREINBEFORE MENTIONED DURING FESTIVAL PERIODS AND AT OTHER TIMES AS OCCASIONS ARISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 45
Munro House
Murphy Street
LONDON
SE1 7AL
- Phone:
- 07957716653
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window