HOGHTON SOCIAL AND SPORTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HALL IS LET TO LOCAL GROUPS FOR THEIR ACTIVITIES. SCOUTS, JUDO CLUB. LUNCHEON CLUB, AUTUMN CLUB, GENERAL FUND RAISING, ZUMBA, PILATES, FOLK DANCING, CREATIVE DANCE, WOMENS' INSTITUTE, ANTIQUES FAIRS, POLLING STATION AND OTHER PARTY AND SOCIAL FUNCTIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 October 2024
Total income includes £3,600 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 November 1974: Standard registration
- HOGHTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD TATTERSALL | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Abbott | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GORDON KIRKBY | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rory McDonald | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MILLIE SANTUS | Trustee | 21 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SANTUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joan Houghton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IAN MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2020 | 15/10/2021 | 15/10/2022 | 15/10/2023 | 15/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.13k | £47.46k | £28.16k | £27.90k | £31.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.99k | £15.25k | £13.16k | £32.77k | £21.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.83k | £3.32k | £450 | £3.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 October 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
HOGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 FAR NOOK
WHITTLE-LE-WOODS
CHORLEY
PR6 7NY
- Phone:
- 01257273185
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window