Trustees MOORSIDE SPORTS CLUB LTD
Charity number: 1153119

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL RUSSELL JOHN ARNOLD | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Quillinan | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hyman | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Partington | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Egerton | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Robert Mitchell | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BOWERMAN | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOYCE MITCHELL | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Egerton | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mitchell | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND ENTWISTLE | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.