Financial history BISPHAM HALL SCOUT ESTATE

Charity number: 503724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.02k £76.67k £60.25k £91.00k £94.33k
Total expenditure £88.14k £59.19k £56.64k £96.53k £94.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £46.30k £12.00k N/A N/A