THE LIBERTARIAN RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the subject of civil rights and liberties of the individual in society, in particular but not exclusively by the promotion and undertaking of study and research and the dissemination of the useful results thereof. To promote the sound administration and development of the law relating to the civil rights and liberties of the individual (without limitation)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
Governance
- 28 November 2013: Standard registration
- 04 November 2015: Funds received from 282624 THE LIBERTARIAN RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TRUST
- STATEWATCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie-Laure Basilien-Gainche | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Almeida Ferreira | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laure Baudrihaye-Gerard | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Bloch | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Finch | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Lilana Keith | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA CANNING | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.03k | £97.17k | £139.78k | £44.28k | £312.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.43k | £76.15k | £72.11k | £112.45k | £193.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/11/2013 as amended on 16 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND LIBERTIES OF THE INDIVIDUAL IN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION AND UNDERTAKING OF STUDY AND RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 2. TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LAW RELATING TO THE CIVIL RIGHTS AND LIBERTIES OF THE INDIVIDUAL, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: 2.1 ADVANCING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE LAW RELATING TO CIVIL RIGHTS AND LIBERTIES AND HOW THE UK, EU INSTITUTIONS, AND OTHER DEMOCRACIES UPHOLD AND ENFORCE SUCH LAWS; 2.2 PROVIDING SEARCHABLE AND REGULARLY UPDATED DATABASES, NEWS AND REPORTS ON LEGISLATIVE MEASURES IN RELATION TO CIVIL RIGHTS AND LIBERTIES PASSING THROUGH THE UK, EU INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER DEMOCRACIES; AND 2.3 PROVIDING NEWS, EXPERT ADVICE AND ANALYSIS ON THE IMPLEMENTATION AND ENFORCEMENT OF EXISTING LAWS IN RELATION TO CIVIL RIGHTS AND LIBERTIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O MDR
88 Fleet Street
London
EC4Y 1DH
- Phone:
- 02036915227
- Email:
- admin@statewatch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window