Accounts and annual returns THE OLD DALBY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 503727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 13 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 June 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 June 2024 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 June 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 08 June 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window