Financial history THE OLD DALBY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 503727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £73.92k £68.87k £79.73k £87.08k £137.67k
Total expenditure £61.57k £68.53k £81.10k £97.57k £123.48k
Income from government contracts £57.32k £18.47k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.46k N/A N/A N/A £78.11k