SHILOH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth activities, Womens' activities, Educational projects, Training and Development,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 03 June 2013: Standard registration
- SHILOH TABERNACLE (Working name)
- SHILOH TABERNACLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reuben Guma | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev JOYOUS GUMA | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.05k | £71.38k | £68.34k | £55.54k | £66.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.82k | £79.90k | £82.10k | £59.82k | £64.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 378 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 429 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND GLOBALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES (PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS) PRODUCING OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, AUDIO AND VISUAL IMAGES ON CHRISTIANITY DESIGNED TO PROVIDE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES THAT DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES, AND CAPABILITIES, TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 4. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHILOH TABERNACLE
BLOCK ONE
UNIT 9
WOOLWICH DOCKYARD INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
WOOLWICH CHURCH STREET
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02034174321
- Email:
- church@shiloh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window