LITTLE ROOTS CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children explore how to plant, care for and harvest the vegetables, fruit and flowers that are grown at Little Roots Allotment. We promote healthy living through physical activity, social interaction and the accessibility to fresh produce. We encourage the sharing of knowledge between generations, introducing children to gardening experiences that some may seldom have the opportunity to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 September 2013: Standard registration
- LITTLE ROOTS (Working name)
- LITTLE ROOTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Bell | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Alan Devonshire | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joyce Bosnjak | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
JUNE FRANCES RYAN | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.66k | £17.54k | £12.03k | £11.63k | £4.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.95k | £16.33k | £18.58k | £11.79k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 APR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/08/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION. 2. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY ALLOTMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 26 Brown Avenue
Mansfield Woodhouse
MANSFIELD
NG19 8HQ
- Phone:
- 01623 607257
- Website:
-
littleroots.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window