BETHESDA CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity primarily supports a new children's home in Mettupalayam,Tamil Nadu, South India for up to 150 children and young people run by Pastor G Samuel as part of the work of Bethesda Mission Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 16 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN JAMES HOUSE | Chair | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Torrance | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Thomas | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Russell | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|||||
LINDA JOAN EKE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PARSONS | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT EKE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.85k | £35.35k | £34.81k | £24.79k | £28.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.41k | £35.07k | £33.38k | £26.84k | £24.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTHERN INDIA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Mina Road
LONDON
SE17 2QS
- Phone:
- 07979800272
- Email:
- info@bethesdachildren.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window