THE ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ST THOMAS' LUPUS TRUST SPONSORS RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASE KNOWN AS LUPUS AT THE LOUISE COOTE LUPUS UNIT IN ST THOMAS HOSPITAL AND PROMOTES PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THIS DEBILITATING DISEASE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 2013: CIO registration
- 14 January 2015: Funds received from 1010523 THE ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST
- 26 February 2018: Funds transferred to
- 26 February 2018: Removed (Removed by application)
- ST THOMAS LUPUS TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/04/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £111.36k | £118.61k | £208.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £217.77k | £139.19k | £91.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 08 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 06 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 06 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 11 April 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2014 | 29 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR: A)TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO SYSTEMIC ERYTHEMATOSUS (LUPUS) B)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CAUSES EFFECTS AND PROPER TREATMENT OF LUPUS C)TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LUPUS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window