OX CLOSE FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Durham
Governance
- 20 May 2013: Standard registration
- 30 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £2.71k | £3.07k | £1.44k | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £3.47k | £3.54k | £1.65k | £790 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window