Accounts and annual returns ABOVE THE STAG THEATRE

Charity number: 1154069
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 January 2023 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 January 2023 81 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time