CALLUM PITE'S SMILE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity operates in the areas of Lincolnshire, Cambridgeshire, Norfolk, Bedfordshire, Suffolk and Hertfordshire. Our fundraising activities include bingo's, dances, collections in supermarkets, the selling of merchandise with the charity logo on and other events held and supported by the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Hertfordshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE JUNE PITE | Chair | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon PITE | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Garner | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Penta | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leo Munson | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE LUCCA | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE BETTINSON | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE SHORTLAND | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE CLARKE | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.72k | £12.54k | £6.70k | £5.92k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £14.34k | £7.06k | £11.34k | £13.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2016 null
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 13 AND 19 YEARS, WHO ARE CURRENTLY UNDERGOING TREATMENT FOR CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF EITHER GIFTS OR FUNDING FOR DAY TRIPS AND OR A FAMILY HOLIDAY IN OUR OWN HOLIDAY HOME IN SKEGNESS, LINCOLNSHIRE IN ORDER TO FULFIL THEIR WISHES AND PROVIDE DISTRACTION AND COMFORT. THE HOLIDAY CAN BE BOOKED WHILST ON TREATMENT BUT MUST BE TAKEN WITHIN 6 MONTHS OF COMPLETING TREATMENT, OUR HOLIDAY HOME BOOKINGS WILL FOLLOW THE RULES AND GUIDELINES SET OUT BY THE SITE AND MUST BE FOLLOWED AT ALL TIMES BY ANYONE USING THE HOLIDAY HOME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Estella Way
SPALDING
PE11 1HS
- Phone:
- 01775711358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window