PENIEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday and mid week Services, Sunday School, Craft Class, Food Bank, Residential Home Services, Mothers & Toddlers group, Children's/Young People's Meeting, Ladies' Meeting, visits to some local schools by our Pastor for Morning Assemblies, Summer Camp places for some children. Cafe/Church, held monthly in a local Tea Room.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 02 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM CURNOW | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Day | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Tabor | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW NORBURY | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SOUTHWOOD | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.40k | £47.60k | £57.76k | £63.57k | £150.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.02k | £46.90k | £50.50k | £62.61k | £147.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH SHALL BE:- (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN [ ] AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF [THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING] [THE MANAGING TRUSTEES] FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peniel Church
Station Street
MAESTEG
County Borough of Bridgend
CF34 9AL
- Phone:
- 01656 731757
- Email:
- penielmaesteg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window