Wild Life Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YWPF provides grants and can arrange expert support in the areas of exotic species conservation and welfare. YWPF will also consider supporting research which moves forward the knowledge and public benefit of exotic species conservation and welfare. Finally YWPF will look at supporting projects which inform and educate the public about keys issues impacting exotic species conservation and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2013: Standard registration
- YWPF (Working name)
- YORKSHIRE WILDLIFE PARK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER RUDGARD WEBSTER | Chair | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Bramah | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
NEVILLE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mark Thomas | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
RUTH REDFERN FRSA FCMI | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHERYL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHARLES EDWARD SAMUEL WHITBREAD | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.70k | £60.76k | £51.64k | £79.59k | £102.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.98k | £63.28k | £114.84k | £140.27k | £114.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2012 as amended on 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION AND WELFARE OF EXOTIC AND OTHER SPECIES OF ENDANGERED WILDLIFE BOTH IN THEIR NATURAL HABITAT AND IN CAPTIVITY; 2. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO EXOTIC AND OTHER SPECIES OF ENDANGERED WILDLIFE; AND 3. PROMOTING ANY OTHER PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH CONSERVATION AND ANIMAL WELFARE AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkshire Wildlife Park
Brockholes Lane
Branton
Doncaster
DN3 3NH
- Phone:
- 07788907706
- Email:
- cheryl.williams@ywpf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window