Financial history BREAKHEART COMMUNITY PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1154572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.63k £11.63k £16.79k £19.81k £11.21k
Total expenditure £12.23k £12.23k £15.63k £30.11k £9.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k £10.00k N/A N/A