Financial history CARE AND RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £481.32k £374.05k £316.00k £55.70k £61.90k
Total expenditure £490.53k £366.67k £272.00k £72.91k £26.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.88k £11.04k N/A N/A