CARE AND RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Its principal activity is the prevention and relief of property and sickness anywhere in the world and in particular amongst those affected by natural disasters, wars, conflicts, financial hardship and to advance education through the provision and support to organise mainstream and supplementary education with particular regard to orphans, refugees, disabled and displaced people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Pakistan
- Turkey
Governance
- 31 May 2013: Standard registration
- CRF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Waheed | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aurange Zaib | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR M AHMED | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £481.32k | £374.05k | £316.00k | £55.70k | £61.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £490.53k | £366.67k | £272.00k | £72.91k | £26.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.88k | £11.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF PROPERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL DISASTERS, WARS, CONFLICTS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN EMERGENCIES, BY THE PROVISION OF MONETARY OR OTHER ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING MEDICINES, HOSPITALS, SHELTER AND FOOD. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISE MAINSTREAM AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION AND FACILITATING BASIC LITERACY AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT, WITH THE OVERALL AIM TO IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE, ENHANCE LIFE SKILLS, IMPROVE LIVELIHOOD OPPORTUNITIES AND ENGAGE THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OTHER COMMUNITIES THROUGH LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO ORPHANS, REFUGEES, DISABLED AND DISPLACED PEOPLE; C) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 WOODFIELD ROAD
BALSALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B12 8TE
- Phone:
- 01217161075
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window