DESTINY SPRINGS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1151826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Destiny Springs International made a donation of mixed clothing to Cancer.Destiny Springs also made a donation of boxes of sugar to Biscester food bank in Oxfordshire Oxford.Destiny Springs international is currently preparing to donate food stuff to a home in Oxfordshire for Children with disability..

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,340
Total expenditure: £1,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • DESTINY SPRINGS MISSIONS INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop Dr DAVID OSEI Chair 26 April 2013
None on record
Mina Kwabea Krah Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Ruth Najeme Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Hariette Aikins Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.00k £11.00k £3.70k £1.46k £1.34k
Total expenditure £6.00k £11.00k £3.90k £1.49k £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
92 FETTIPLACE ROAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 9LL
Phone:
07508766148