Financial history THE BESOM IN TAUNTON

Charity number: 1152511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £23.81k £33.01k £28.59k £38.84k £33.20k
Total expenditure £25.41k £31.36k £27.31k £36.96k £34.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k N/A N/A N/A