THE BESOM IN TAUNTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Besom in Taunton is a charity which helps Christians go out and serve their community. It provides links between social agencies and churches, so that those who are in need can be reached by those who feel called to serve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Peter Gainsford | Chair | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Fenton | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Christopher Turner | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Roger Keith Habgood | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.81k | £33.01k | £28.59k | £38.84k | £33.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.41k | £31.36k | £27.31k | £36.96k | £34.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ENGLISH LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O St James Church
St James Street
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 3ED
- Phone:
- 07432629444
- Email:
- besomtaunton@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window