ZANJABIIL RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES, TRAINING CENTRES, AND PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING;TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Leicester City
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 08 July 2013: Standard registration
- ZARDO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Aden Mohamed | Chair | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED WARSAME YUSUF | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
FAHAD OMAR SAID | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220 | £1.04k | £100 | £20 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £800 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES, TRAINING CENTRES, AND PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING;TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES,INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS;TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, FACILITIES, SUCH AS HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Daisy House
Middle Road
LONDON
W7 3FN
- Phone:
- 07984984224
- Email:
- alimohamed6876@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window