HOUSE OF PRAYERS AND DOMINION CHAPEL UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Praise & Worships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Luton
Governance
- 03 July 2013: Standard registration
- HOUSE OF PRAYER AND DOMINION CHAPEL UK (Previous name)
- HOUSE OF PRAYER AND DOMINION CHAPEL UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUELA ASAMOAH | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE OBIRI-YEBOAH | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE KWADWO WIAFE | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.41k | £69.49k | £78.65k | £75.18k | £68.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.84k | £64.61k | £81.33k | £63.72k | £70.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/06/2013
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Grove Road
Houghton Regis
DUNSTABLE
LU5 5PD
- Phone:
- 07950412878
- Email:
- HOPADC@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window