Financial history HEALTHWATCH HILLINGDON

Charity Number: 1152553
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £159.29k £185.29k £133.00k £243.18k £244.17k
Total expenditure £176.40k £152.61k £145.29k £195.20k £217.79k
Income from government contracts N/A £158.00k N/A N/A £158.00k
Income from government grants £158.00k N/A £133.00k £158.00k £86.00k