Financial history JUBILEE COMMUNITY CHURCH (EAST GRINSTEAD)

Charity number: 1153068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £613.66k £558.14k £648.19k £657.24k £688.19k
Total expenditure £502.01k £457.87k £582.04k £699.51k £711.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.62k £1.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £479.34k £398.73k £429.45k £421.29k £446.99k
Income - Other trading activities £47.23k £47.24k £53.96k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £87.00k £109.93k £156.40k £174.01k £181.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £86 £377 £651 £0 £59.55k
Income - Other £0 £25 £7.73k £61.94k £297
Income - Legacies £0 £9.26k £9.13k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £501.07k £457.87k £582.04k £699.51k £711.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £938 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.09k £6.70k £12.83k £14.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0