Trustees JUBILEE COMMUNITY CHURCH (EAST GRINSTEAD)

Charity number: 1153068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK EDWARD HARVEY Chair 11 November 2019
None on record
Fiona Straszynski Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
Julian Brendon Holbrook Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Sam Jeremy Gunter Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
HANNAH BAPTIST Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Nathan Down Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
CRISTINE MARIA PAYNE Trustee 23 July 2013
None on record