ARUN EAST UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arun East U3A is part of the great network of self help groups which form the U3A and promote life-long learning and leisure activities for older people no longer in full time employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2013: Standard registration
- ARUN EAST U3A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann Balk | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Simmance | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN DAVIDOFF | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Midgley | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rosamund Gillespie | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Willcox | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.65k | £17.81k | £40.47k | £62.25k | £64.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.38k | £12.21k | £43.19k | £54.29k | £61.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 16 June 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 12 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Preston Avenue
Rustington
LITTLEHAMPTON
West Sussex
BN16 2DE
- Phone:
- 07849633750
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window