Trustees BREAKING CONVENTION EVENTS
Charity number: 1159687

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE LUKE | Chair | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Howard Hughes | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Jakob Beiner | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Wells | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Wyrd | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Tollan | Trustee | 15 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.