ST. PETER'S R.C. PRIMARY PTFA

Charity number: 1152028
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are the parent, teacher, friend/family association for St. Peter's R.C. Primary School, Earl Shilton. We raise funds to support and enhance the educational experience of the children in our school. We raise money in the local community through fetes, fairs, jumble sales, bake sales, discos, non uniform days, race nights etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016

Total income: £3,175
Total expenditure: £4,210

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2013: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST. PETER'S PTFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £5.21k £4.79k £3.18k
Total expenditure £6.16k £6.08k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 16 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required