Accounts and annual returns FIREBIRD GYMNASTICS CLUB CIO

Charity number: 1152505
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time