BECKTON SKILLS CENTRE

Charity Number: 1152580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OLD BY DEVELOPING THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES AND UNDERSTANDING OF SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE THROUGH ACCREDITED VOCATIONAL TRAINING, LIFE SKILLS, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £133,606
Total expenditure: £113,922

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham
  • Essex
  • Havering
  • Newham
  • Redbridge
  • Waltham Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Nadine Campbell Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Oliver David Colman Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Jane Ludden Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Benjamin James Robb Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
Julie Ann Chant Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £126.98k £145.94k £116.07k £118.94k £133.61k
Total expenditure £153.82k £141.10k £122.42k £111.91k £113.92k
Income from government contracts £29.43k £40.12k £40.81k N/A £22.60k
Income from government grants £5.27k N/A £16.00k £7.99k £15.26k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BECKTON SKILLS CENTRE
7 HILLCROFT ROAD
LONDON
E6 6LW
Phone:
02075113000