4MOTION DARLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
4Motion Darlington was setup to provide activities and facilities or biking, skateboarding, scooters and in-line skates. We run bike coaching at West Park bike track and have developed an indoor skatepark facility which was fully opened on 5th April 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 23 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK LEEMING | Chair | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Craig Peter Tervit | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edmund Gwyther | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVE WOODCOCK | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.36k | £160.86k | £265.68k | £267.69k | £346.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.30k | £183.72k | £212.48k | £257.25k | £316.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £39.50k | £5.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/04/2013
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DARLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ROLLER-SKATING, SCOOTERING, SKATEBOARDING AND BIKING, FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.(II)TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER CAN BE APPROPRIATELY CARRIED ON IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE ACTIVITIES CARRIED ON PURSUANT TO THE FIRST OBJECT MENTIONED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF DARLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Motion Darlington
Faverdale Industrial Estate
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 0PP
- Phone:
- 01325460550
- Email:
- info@4motiondarlington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window