Financial history WHITLEY BAY PANTOMIME SOCIETY

Charity number: 1156038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.18k £200 £38.06k £31.42k £17.94k
Total expenditure £26.54k £1.74k £28.04k £28.87k £26.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A