URBAN EXTREME LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a recreational / leisure facilities in Barrow in Furness and Cumbria. Young people of barrow and the surrounding areas need the use of this indoor skate park and will it will provide a safe, secure and controlled environment for people of all ages to ride there BMX, scooter, skates or skateboard, They can ride there BMX, Scooter, Skates or Skateboard to their full potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAIN LEWIS | Chair | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN SCALES | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCAS HOGG | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.10k | £103.78k | £80.21k | £84.31k | £78.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.10k | £78.32k | £78.32k | £80.03k | £79.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £72.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 March 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 March 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 November 2024 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 24 November 2024 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BARROW IN FURNESS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Urban Extreme
James Freel Close
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
LA14 2NW
- Phone:
- 01229343110
- Email:
- urbanextreme@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window