Financial history REDDITCH MOSQUE TRUST

Charity Number: 503752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £199.39k £223.47k £267.40k £238.09k £343.89k
Total expenditure £155.84k £132.65k £167.94k £207.09k £274.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £49.32k £18.06k N/A N/A