Financial history WALTHAM FOREST YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity number: 1152939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.18k £30.62k £20.86k £45.00k £20.13k
Total expenditure £48.77k £40.10k £37.42k £42.64k £40.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A